This case was last updated from Gilchrist County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 19:33:50 (UTC).

BEAM, LUCIEN KENT, HOUSER, KIMBERLY LYNN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 BEAM, LUCIEN KENT, HOUSER, KIMBERLY LYNN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Gilchrist County Courts, Gilchrist County Courthouse located in Gilchrist, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROEB, ROBERT KIRK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Gilchrist, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROEB, ROBERT KIRK

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HOUSER, KIMBERLY LYNN

Decedent

BEAM, LUCIEN KENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEXEMPLIFICATION COPIES COMPOSITE CONSISTING OF: APPLICATION FOR PROBATE AND LETTERS; CERTIFICATE OF PROBATE; ORDER AUTHORIZING ISSUANCE OF LETTERS; LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM LINDSEY B. LANDER ATTORNEY AT LAW DATED 04/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 24545

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCase 212022CP000017CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD