This case was last updated from Franklin County Courts on 12/07/2019 at 14:00:30 (UTC).

WEBB, WILLIAM WAYNE VS TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 WEBB, WILLIAM WAYNE filed an Other lawsuit against TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC. This case was filed in Franklin County Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Franklin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Franklin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB, WILLIAM WAYNE

Defendant

TALLAHASSEE ORTHOPEDIC CLINIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ABELE, KENNETH PAUL

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/04/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/07/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/22/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/07/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/07/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

11/07/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number 14 5141

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCase 192019CC000131CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less