This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Franklin County on 12/20/2019 at 13:30:30 (UTC).

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANC VS SHIVER, ANGI Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHIVER, ANGI. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Franklin County, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DODSON, CHARLES W and CHARLES DODSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Second Circuit Courts - Franklin County

  • Courthouse:

    Franklin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DODSON, CHARLES W

CHARLES DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANC

Defendants

SHIVER, LEONARD

SHIVER, ANGI

TENANT, UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, LESLIE SINGLETERRY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE

12/05/2019:MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/05/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

12/17/2019:MOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/05/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/06/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

12/05/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

12/19/2019:ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/17/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/05/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/05/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/05/2019:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 3/9/2020 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge CHARLES DODSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: DODSON , CHARLES W Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number 14 5158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase 192019CA000356CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/5/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/09/2020 13:00; Judge: DODSON, CHARLES W; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 3RD FL

    Read MoreRead Less