This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/18/2022 at 05:58:38 (UTC).

ST JAMES BAY OWNERS ASSOCIATIO VS PATRENOS, GEORGE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 ST JAMES BAY OWNERS ASSOCIATIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PATRENOS, GEORGE. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHULER, J GORDON and J GORDON SHULER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHULER, J GORDON

J GORDON SHULER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST JAMES BAY OWNERS ASSOCIATIO

Defendants

PATRENOS, GEORGE

STANLEY, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARDNER, KRISTIN AMANDA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/05/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/05/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/05/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/06/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/06/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF PTC

01/24/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF PTC

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/25/2022 10:40; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: APALACHICOLA COURTHOUSE ANNEX JUDGE'

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE on 1/25/2022 1040 AM Judge J GORDON SHULER results CANCELLED on 1/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF PTC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/09/2021 14:10; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: APALACHICOLA COURTHOUSE ANNEX JUDGE'

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 1/25/2022 at 1040 AM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number 14 5807

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $20.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCLERKS NOTES ATTORNEYS OFFICE CALLED REQUESTING NEW SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED DUE TO NOT BEING ABLE TO OBTAIN SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED AND EMAILED TO ATTORNEYS OFFICE TS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 11/10/2021 at 1140 AM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number 14 5768

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $320.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase 192021SC000067SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTIN GARDNER