This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/13/2022 at 12:59:13 (UTC).

RITCH, JOYCE, RITCH, PETER JOSEPH Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 RITCH, JOYCE, RITCH, PETER JOSEPH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC and SJOSTROM, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RITCH, JOYCE

Decedent

RITCH, PETER JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUNCAN, DONNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketObjection To Claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJudge: SJOSTROM , JONATHAN Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number 14 5780

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CP000078CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNCAN, DONNA