This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/13/2022 at 12:50:56 (UTC).

PEARSON, WILLIAM M., RUHL, BARBARA I. Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 PEARSON, WILLIAM M , RUHL, BARBARA I was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC and SJOSTROM, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEARSON, WILLIAM M.

Decedent

RUHL, BARBARA I.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHARLES, MARCIE POULOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketOTHER PETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL & APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (ORIGINAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketJudge: SJOSTROM , JONATHAN Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketWaiver Of Notice Of Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketWaiver Of Notice Of Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number 14 5747

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CP000070CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCIE A CHARLES