This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/19/2022 at 07:02:17 (UTC).

OMEARA, GARRY Et Al VS BOWER, CONSTANCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 OMEARA, GARRY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BOWER, CONSTANCE. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are J GORDON SHULER, SHULER, J GORDON and SJOSTROM, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

J GORDON SHULER

SHULER, J GORDON

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OMEARA, GARRY

OMEARA, SARAH

Defendants

BOWER, CONSTANCE

BOWER, GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUNCAN, DONNA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

10/28/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/02/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/02/21

11/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/02/21

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/02/21

11/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/02/21

ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/09/2021:ANSWERS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

11/09/2021:MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING

11/17/2021:NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING

11/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

ORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT REGISTRY DEPOSIT

11/23/2021:ORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT REGISTRY DEPOSIT

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

01/20/2022:ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

02/16/2022:ORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

NOTICE OF FILING COUNTY CIVIL MEDIATION INVOICE

03/31/2022:NOTICE OF FILING COUNTY CIVIL MEDIATION INVOICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COUNTY CIVIL MEDIATION INVOICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT NOTICE OF MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/16/2022 14:15; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 3RD FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 2/16/2022 at 0215 PM, MX - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/23/2021 13:30; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: EVIDENTIARY HEARING; Location: APALACHICOLA COURTHOUSE ANNEX JUDGE'

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event EVIDENTIARY HEARING on 11/23/2021 0130 PM Judge J GORDON SHULER results DISPOSED on 11/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT REGISTRY DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCLERKS NOTES SUMMONS NOT TO BE ISSUED UNTIL INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS ARE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number 14 5758

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $195.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CC000044CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNCAN, DONNA