This case was last updated from Franklin County Courts on 12/08/2019 at 14:00:44 (UTC).

MARSHALL, DOLORSE Et Al VS BRADLEY, CHYNEENE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 MARSHALL, DOLORSE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BRADLEY, CHYNEENE. This case was filed in Franklin County Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHULER, J GORDON and J GORDON SHULER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Franklin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Franklin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHULER, J GORDON

J GORDON SHULER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARSHALL, JAMES

MARSHALL, DOLORSE

Defendants

BRADLEY, WAYNE

BRADLEY, CHYNEENE

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT 1

11/26/2019:EXHIBIT 1

ANSWER

11/12/2019:ANSWER

ORDER SETTING HEARING

11/13/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOTH PARTIES, PLAINTIFF SPELLED NAMES

11/08/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO BOTH PARTIES, PLAINTIFF SPELLED NAMES

RETURN OF SERVICE ON WAYNE BRADLEY SERVED 11/08/19

11/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON WAYNE BRADLEY SERVED 11/08/19

RETURN OF SERVICE ON CHYNEENE BRADLEY 11/08/19 SUB SERVICE SPOUSE

11/12/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE ON CHYNEENE BRADLEY 11/08/19 SUB SERVICE SPOUSE

RECEIPT - RENT $800.00 PLUS REGISTRA FEES $19.50

11/12/2019:RECEIPT - RENT $800.00 PLUS REGISTRA FEES $19.50

3 DAY NOTICE

11/08/2019:3 DAY NOTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCOPY OF CHECK #2054 PAYABLE TO PLAINTIFFS FOR $800.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated Event EVICTION on 11/26/2019 0145 PM Judge J GORDON SHULER results DISPOSED on 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketEvent EVICTION scheduled on 11/26/2019 at 0145 PM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $19.50 Receipt Number CC 2019000045

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ONLY NON PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketActive Process CC EVICTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number CC 2019000044

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $205.00 Balance Remaining $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCase 192019CC000130CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/26/2019 13:45; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: EVICTION; Location: CA ANNEX COURTROOM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.