This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/18/2022 at 05:58:59 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JOHNSON, NANCY J

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHNSON, NANCY J. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHULER, J GORDON and J GORDON SHULER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHULER, J GORDON

J GORDON SHULER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JOHNSON, NANCY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HINES, MICHELLE KIM

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/28/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

10/28/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/02/21

11/04/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/02/21

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/09/2021 11:00; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: APALACHICOLA COURTHOUSE ANNEX JUDGE'; Defendant Attorney: Hines, Michelle Kim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE on 12/9/2021 1100 AM Judge J GORDON SHULER results CANCELLED on 11/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/02/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/9/2021 at 1100 AM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number 14 5757

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase 192021SC000064SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM