This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Franklin County on 11/29/2021 at 13:48:57 (UTC).

JOSEPH, VALERIE VS MASSEY, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 JOSEPH, VALERIE filed an Other lawsuit against MASSEY, JESSICA. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Franklin County, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SJOSTROM, JONATHAN, SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC and JONATHAN SJOSTROM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC

JONATHAN SJOSTROM

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSEPH, VALERIE

Respondent

MASSEY, JESSICA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

09/14/2021:COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/14/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE 09/16/21

09/20/2021:AFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE 09/16/21

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

10/15/2021:MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

ORDER SETTING HEARING

10/21/2021:ORDER SETTING HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED NOTICE OF HEARING

10/26/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER SETTING HEARING

11/18/2021:ORDER SETTING HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/30/2021 11:30; Judge: SJOSTROM, JONATHAN; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: LEON COUNTY COURTHOUSE LEON C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 11/30/2021 at 1130 AM, LC - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/15/2021 14:00; Judge: SJOSTROM, JONATHAN; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: LEON COUNTY COURTHOUSE LEON C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 11/15/2021 at 0200 PM, LC - Judge JONATHAN SJOSTROM presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT/RETURN OF SERVICE 09/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CA000044CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: SJOSTROM , JONATHAN assigned

    Read MoreRead Less