This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/13/2022 at 12:50:21 (UTC).

HOGAN, HOLT FREDRICK, HOGAN, PHYLLIS M Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 HOGAN, HOLT FREDRICK, HOGAN, PHYLLIS M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

HOGAN, HOLT FREDRICK

Not Classified By Court

HOGAN, PHYLLIS M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WATKINS, STEVE MOORE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO CONVERT TO SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEXEMPLIFIED COPIES FROM STATE OF GEORGIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketANCILLARY LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING ANCILLARY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ADMITTING WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN/PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION ANCILLARY LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER FORMAL ADMINISTRATION CHECKLIST FOR OPENING ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number 14 5754

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CP000071CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/28/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS, STEVE MOORE