This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/19/2022 at 07:09:17 (UTC).

COASTLINE RENTALS LLC VS SOPCHOPPY PIZZA COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 COASTLINE RENTALS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SOPCHOPPY PIZZA COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHULER, J GORDON and J GORDON SHULER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHULER, J GORDON

J GORDON SHULER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COASTLINE RENTALS LLC

Defendant

SOPCHOPPY PIZZA COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINACCI, DAVID KENNETH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/08/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/08/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/08/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/08/2021:COMPLAINT

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/03/21

12/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/03/21

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/03/21 ON SOPCHOPPY PIZZA COMPANY LLC

12/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/03/21 ON SOPCHOPPY PIZZA COMPANY LLC

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/03/21

12/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED 12/03/21

ANSWER OF SOPCHOPPY PIZZA COMPANY, LLC

12/27/2021:ANSWER OF SOPCHOPPY PIZZA COMPANY, LLC

ANSWER OF VERBON DALE SCOTT JR

12/27/2021:ANSWER OF VERBON DALE SCOTT JR

NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL READINESS

01/07/2022:NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL READINESS

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

01/13/2022:ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL

02/17/2022:ORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE MOTION TO CANCEL TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/21/2022 13:30; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: NON JURY TRIAL; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE 3RD FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event NON JURY TRIAL on 3/21/2022 0130 PM Judge J GORDON SHULER results CANCELLED on 3/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketORDER CANCELING TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketEvent NON JURY TRIAL scheduled on 3/21/2022 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/17/2022 09:00; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: APALACHICOLA COURTHOUSE ANNEX JUDGE'

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER FOR NON JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent CASAE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 2/17/2022 at 0900 AM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL READINESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $330.00 Receipt Number 14 5769

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $330.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $330.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CC000046CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/8/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Minacci