This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/18/2022 at 05:58:46 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE VS BURKE, BRENDA S

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BURKE, BRENDA S. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHULER, J GORDON and J GORDON SHULER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHULER, J GORDON

J GORDON SHULER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE

Defendant

BURKE, BRENDA S

Eastpoint, FL 32328-3368

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/03/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/03/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/06/21

11/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/06/21

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/24/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCLERKS NOTES FROM HEARING HELD ON 12/09/21 PARITES BY ZOOM AND SETTLED, STIP FORTHCOMING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE on 12/9/2021 1140 AM Judge J GORDON SHULER results DISPOSED on 12/9/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/09/2021 11:40; Judge: SHULER, J GORDON; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: APALACHICOLA COURTHOUSE ANNEX JUDGE'

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/06/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketEvent PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 12/9/2021 at 1140 AM, CA - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number 14 5765

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCase 192021SC000066SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/3/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JASON DRAGUTSKY