This case was last updated from Franklin County Courts on 12/07/2019 at 19:01:01 (UTC).

BROWN, KIM VS BROWN, BENNY N

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 BROWN, KIM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BROWN, BENNY N. This case was filed in Franklin County Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DODSON, CHARLES W, J GORDON SHULER and SHULER, J GORDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Franklin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Franklin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DODSON, CHARLES W

J GORDON SHULER

SHULER, J GORDON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BROWN, KIM

Respondent

BROWN, BENNY N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 12/17/2019 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge J GORDON SHULER presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketJudge: DODSON , CHARLES W Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCase 192019DR000331DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less