This case was last updated from Franklin County Florida Courts on 04/19/2022 at 07:02:11 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS AMALFITANO, DEBORA D

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed an Other lawsuit against AMALFITANO, DEBORA D. This case was filed in Franklin County Florida Courts, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULER, J GORDON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULER, J GORDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

AMALFITANO, DEBORA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLEISCHER, REBECA MISDRAJI

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

11/02/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF COVER SHEET

11/02/2021:NOTICE OF COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/08/21

11/09/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 11/08/21

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT

11/18/2021:ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT

ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION

12/07/2021:ORDER REQUIRING MEDIATION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

12/09/2021:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION FEE

12/09/2021:NOTICE OF MEDIATION FEE

CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

12/27/2021:CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

MOTION TO EXCUSE PARTY FROM MEDIATION

12/27/2021:MOTION TO EXCUSE PARTY FROM MEDIATION

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCUSE PARTY FROM MEDIATION

12/29/2021:ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCUSE PARTY FROM MEDIATION

MEDIATION AGREEMENT

01/24/2022:MEDIATION AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION AMENDED

01/24/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION AMENDED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMINSTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE AND APPOVING MEDIATION AGREEMENT TO THE COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMEDIATOR REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number CC 2022000002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number CC 2021000036

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketJudge: SHULER , J GORDON Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number 14 5762

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CC000045CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/2/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REBECA FLEISCHER