This case was last updated from Second Circuit Courts - Franklin County on 12/24/2021 at 13:32:23 (UTC).

AUDIE, CHARLOTTE Et Al VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 AUDIE, CHARLOTTE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Second Circuit Courts - Franklin County, Franklin County Courthouse located in Franklin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC and SJOSTROM, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Franklin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN ERIC

SJOSTROM, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AUDIE, JOSEPH JR

AUDIE, CHARLOTTE

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGMAN, JOSEPH WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/24/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/24/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/24/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

COMPLAINT

11/24/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK NOT ISSUED $10.00 FEE NEEDS TO BE PAID

11/29/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK NOT ISSUED $10.00 FEE NEEDS TO BE PAID

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

12/02/2021:SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/16/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM ORDER FOR ACTIVE DIFFERENTIAL CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number 14 5802

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketJudge: SJOSTROM , JONATHAN Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK NOT ISSUED $10.00 FEE NEEDS TO BE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number 14 5791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase 192021CA000062CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ligman, Joseph W