Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/13/2021 at 17:09:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. YOUNG, TAMYRA JASWAWLA DIAMOND

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOUNG, TAMYRA JASWAWLA DIAMOND. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************28 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

YOUNG, TAMYRA JASWAWLA DIAMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

4/16/2021: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingDate time: 5/25/2021 10:45 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE25920021 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingDate time: 4/16/2021 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 05/25/2021 AT 10:45 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 04/16/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSMITH, KERRA A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 MM 001628 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (901.36(1)) GIVING FALSE NAME OR ID TO LEO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant