This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/23/2020 at 17:08:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. YOHN, JOSHUA LEE

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOHN, JOSHUA LEE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************40 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

YOHN, JOSHUA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

3/12/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION

3/4/2020: INFORMATION

INFORMATION

3/3/2020: INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

3/2/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/2/2020: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/28/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

2/24/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

2/24/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

ARREST REPORT

2/24/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/5/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/12/2020 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: VIDEO COURTROOM; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/12/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 05/05/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 03/12/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSMITH, KERRA A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000840 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less