This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 16:11:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WRIGHT, ROSHAWN ONEAL JONTE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WRIGHT, ROSHAWN ONEAL JONTE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WRIGHT, ROSHAWN ONEAL JONTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/12/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 004132 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (810.09(2B)) TRESPASSING-FAIL TO LEAVE PROPERTY UPON ORDER BY OWNER

    Read MoreRead Less