Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/13/2021 at 17:13:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WILLIAMS, PATRICK VINCENT JR

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, PATRICK VINCENT JR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN, ROBINSON, COLEMAN L and SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************03 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, PATRICK VINCENT JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingDate time: 7/14/2021 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingDate time: 5/7/2021 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 07/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (784.045(1B)) AGGRAV BATTERY-OFFENDER KNEW OR SHOULD HAVE KNOWN VICTIM WAS PREGNANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 05/07/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 04/16/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CF 001703 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (784.045(1A1)) AGGRAV BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.045(1A1)) AGGRAV BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant