This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 20:27:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WILLIAMS, DAIREAN JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, DAIREAN JOSEPH. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CLARK, LACEY POWELL and KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, DAIREAN JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorneys

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

NICHOLLS, WESLEY GEORGE II

 

Court Documents

BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

9/4/2019: BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

9/4/2019: BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/6/2019: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

2/19/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINT REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

2/19/2019: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINT REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/15/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

ARREST REPORT

1/28/2019: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING UNCONTESTED MOTION TO SUPPRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • HearingDate time: 9/4/2019 9:00 AM; Event: CRIMINAL PLEAS & MOTIONS; Judge: CLARK, LACEY POWELL; Location: COURTROOM 405; Result: MOTION HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 2; Description: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS (893.13(6b)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: DISMISSED [D]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: CARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON-FIREARM (790.01(2)); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: DISMISSED [D]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NO PLEA ENTERED SEQ 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NO PLEA ENTERED SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/15/2019 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCLARK, LACEY POWELL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND BB5776113 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND BB5776112 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/28/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CF 000682 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (790.01(2)) CARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON-FIREARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (893.13(6B)) MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant