This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 16:10:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WILLGER, ANDRA MARYLYNN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLGER, ANDRA MARYLYNN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************31 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLGER, ANDRA MARYLYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Defendant Attorneys

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

MORRIS, BRANDON S

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WAIVE OF APPEARANCE, WITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR FURY TRIAL

10/2/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WAIVE OF APPEARANCE, WITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR FURY TRIAL

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

10/2/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/1/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

9/29/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

CASH BOND 93208 POSTED $250.00

9/25/2020: CASH BOND 93208 POSTED $250.00

ARREST REPORT

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/15/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPTR AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WAIVE OF APPEARANCE, WITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR FURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/15/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASH BOND 93208 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 004131 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less