This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 17:09:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WIGGINS, BRUCE A

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WIGGINS, BRUCE A. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN, ROBINSON, COLEMAN L and FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WIGGINS, BRUCE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/27/2020 8:30 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/20/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 05/27/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 4 - (506.509) POSSESS STOLEN PROP-ILLEGAL POSSESS SHOPPING OR LAUNDRY CART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 5 - (506.509) POSSESS STOLEN PROP-ILLEGAL POSSESS SHOPPING OR LAUNDRY CART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 6 - (806.13(1B1)) CRIM MISCH-200 DOLLARS AND UNDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 3 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/27/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/27/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000390 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (806.13(1B1)) CRIM MISCH-200 DOLLARS AND UNDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 4 - (810.02(3B)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED DWELLING- UNARMED- NO ASSLT OR BATT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 5 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 6 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (506.509) POSSESS STOLEN PROP-ILLEGAL POSSESS SHOPPING OR LAUNDRY CART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (506.509) POSSESS STOLEN PROP-ILLEGAL POSSESS SHOPPING OR LAUNDRY CART

    Read MoreRead Less