This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 17:12:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. WEATHERS, JONEISHA RENAE DIANE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WEATHERS, JONEISHA RENAE DIANE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WEATHERS, JONEISHA RENAE DIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

Defendant Attorney

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingDate time: 11/23/2020 1:30 PM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 11/23/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO ATTORNEY OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINT REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/15/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND AA20645568 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/15/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 004135 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less