This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 17:00:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. VICKERY, JAMES PAUL

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against VICKERY, JAMES PAUL. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

VICKERY, JAMES PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

3/4/2020: INFORMATION

PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

2/25/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

ARREST REPORT

2/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RESTITUTION AMOUNT FILED BY THE STATE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 05/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 05/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/16/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS (812.014(2)(e)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: GUILTY [G]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE/NO CONTEST SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/25/2020 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: VIDEO COURTROOM; Result: OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/25/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000849 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less