This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 17:02:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. VEACH, SHAWN MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against VEACH, SHAWN MICHAEL. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN, PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

VEACH, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/7/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/6/2020 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/7/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 05/06/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/6/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/07/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN - PER JA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (790.23(1A)) POSSESS OF WEAPON OR AMMO BY CONVICTED FLA FELON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND X60408848 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/06/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketPITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/17/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000271 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (790.23(1A)) POSSESS OF WEAPON OR AMMO BY CONVICTED FLA FELON

    Read MoreRead Less