This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/24/2020 at 17:01:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TOOKES, JOHN DEREK

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TOOKES, JOHN DEREK. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRODERSEN, AMY P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************48 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRODERSEN, AMY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TOOKES, JOHN DEREK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8255.1428 / 2020018458)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 10/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 10/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/25/2020 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: VIDEO COURTROOM; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE (812.014(3a)); Level: M; Degree: S; Disposition: GUILTY [G]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE/NO CONTEST SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/25/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000848 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3A)) PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less