This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 17:02:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. STUPCHENKO, OLEG SERGEEVICH

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STUPCHENKO, OLEG SERGEEVICH. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN, BRODERSEN, AMY P and DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************49 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

BRODERSEN, AMY P

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

STUPCHENKO, OLEG SERGEEVICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E

Defendant Attorneys

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

JENKINS, CHRISTOPHER ALLEN

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/13/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/11/2020: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/5/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

2/4/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINT REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

2/3/2020: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINT REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

1/29/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

1/29/2020: ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/27/2020 8:30 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/13/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: DANNHEISSER., THOMAS; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 05/27/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 3 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (810.02(4A)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/13/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/23/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/23/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000349 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (810.02(4A)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less