This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 17:10:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SOLBERG, RYAN FRANCIS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SOLBERG, RYAN FRANCIS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BERGOSH, GARY L, KINSEY, JENNIE and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************28 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BERGOSH, GARY L

KINSEY, JENNIE

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SOLBERG, RYAN FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION C

Defendant Attorneys

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

CROMEY, JASON H

 

Court Documents

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

10/15/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

MOTION TO MODIFY BOND

10/6/2020: MOTION TO MODIFY BOND

PTR AGREEMENT

9/30/2020: PTR AGREEMENT

ARREST REPORT

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • HearingDate time: 12/29/2020 8:30 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: KINSEY, JENNIE; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/22/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 12/29/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/15/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/22/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (914.22(2B)) TAMPERING IN FELONY 3RD DEGREE PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/15/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketKINSEY, JENNIE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 004128 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASH BOND 93200 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASH BOND 93199 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.045(1B)) AGGRAV BATTERY-OFFENDER KNEW OR SHOULD HAVE KNOWN VICTIM WAS PREGNANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (914.22(2A)) HARASSING IN MISDEMEANOR PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less