This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/06/2020 at 13:37:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SISSON, TINA MARIE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SISSON, TINA MARIE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************20 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SISSON, TINA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO 2020 CT 000707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/12/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: TRANSFERRED/CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: KNOWINGLY DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED, CANCELED, REVOKED, OR THE EQUIVALENT SECOND OR SUBSEQUENT CONVICTION (322.34(2)(b)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO TRAFFIC: 4/1/2020 @ 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT SEQ: 1 - (322.34(2)(B)) KNOWINGLY DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED, CANCELED, REVOKED, OR THE EQUIVALENT SECOND OR SUBSEQUENT CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - A5AY5YE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNOBLES, LINDA L.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5624843542 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/18/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000820 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (322.34(2C)) DRIVING WHILE LIC SUSP THIRD OR SUBSQ CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less