This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 18:54:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SIMS, DEVONTE TAJI

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SIMS, DEVONTE TAJI. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************85 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SIMS, DEVONTE TAJI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/5/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingDate time: 4/1/2020 8:30 AM; Event: CRIMINAL PLEAS & MOTIONS; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/12/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 05/05/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL PLEAS & MOTIONS SET FOR 04/01/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/27/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/27/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketSMITH, KERRA A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE5132046 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT (OUT OF COUNTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/19/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000785 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3A)) PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less