This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 17:03:06 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SHERWOOD, TRINTON RILEY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHERWOOD, TRINTON RILEY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBINSON, COLEMAN L, BERGOSH, GARY L and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

BERGOSH, GARY L

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SHERWOOD, TRINTON RILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorney

BURNS, JAMES M

 

Court Documents

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

10/15/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

10/14/2020: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

ARREST REPORT

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • HearingDate time: 1/27/2021 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/22/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 01/27/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/15/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/22/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF5 70354696 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF5 70354697 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/15/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 004129 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (499.03) POSSESS NEW LEGEND DRUG WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less