This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 17:09:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SAMPSON, MELVIN LEE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMPSON, MELVIN LEE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************80 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAMPSON, MELVIN LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/10/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL RELEASE BOND 2020MM000180 POSTED $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE1540340 POSTED $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingDate time: 1/28/2020 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: VIDEO COURTROOM; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingDate time: 1/28/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 03/10/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN / , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/28/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (741.31(4A)) CONTEMPT OF COURT-VIOL INJUNCTION PROTECTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 01/28/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketFRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000180 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (741.31(4A)) CONTEMPT OF COURT-VIOL INJUNCTION PROTECTION DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less