This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 17:02:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROSADO, DAWN SHAREE

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROSADO, DAWN SHAREE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************64 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROSADO, DAWN SHAREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR

Defendant Attorney

JONES, SHERRY IVEY

 

Court Documents

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/3/2020: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

3/3/2020: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

ARREST REPORT

2/13/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingDate time: 4/14/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/4/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 04/14/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN / , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (316.193(3C1)) DUI DAMAGE TO PROPERTY OR PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT & REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL, REQUEST FOR COPY OF THE INFORMATION, AND NOTICE OF INTENTION TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/04/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5624843399 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000664 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (316.193(1)) DUI ALCOHOL OR DRUGS

    Read MoreRead Less