This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 07:37:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROBINSON, DOMONIC ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBINSON, DOMONIC ANTONIO. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BOLES, W JOEL and CLARK, LACEY POWELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************90 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BOLES, W JOEL

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROBINSON, DOMONIC ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorneys

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

NICHOLLS, WESLEY GEORGE II

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

PTR AGREEMENT

1/11/2019: PTR AGREEMENT

PROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542925 POSTED $5,000.00

1/7/2019: PROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542925 POSTED $5,000.00

PROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542926 POSTED $5,000.00

1/7/2019: PROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542926 POSTED $5,000.00

PROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542924 POSTED $1,000.00

1/7/2019: PROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542924 POSTED $1,000.00

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

1/7/2019: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

ARREST REPORT

1/7/2019: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • HearingDate time: 7/12/2019 8:30 AM; Event: MINI DOCKET DAY; Judge: CLARK, LACEY POWELL; Location: COURTROOM 307; Result: NOLLE PROS/NO PROS/DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 3; Description: BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03(1a1)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 2; Description: FELONY BATTERY OR DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION (784.041(3)); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: KIDNAP FALSE IMPRISONMENT-ADULT (787.02(1a)); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI SEQ: 3 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI SEQ: 2 - (784.041(3)) FELONY BATTERY OR DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542926 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND AA19542924 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/07/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CF 000190 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (784.041(3)) FELONY BATTERY OR DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (787.02(1A)) KIDNAP FALSE IMPRISONMENT-ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLLS, WESLEY GEORGE II