This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 20:25:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RICHARDSON, MORGAN AMELIA

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICHARDSON, MORGAN AMELIA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY, KINSEY, JENNIE, SHACKELFORD, JAN, MILLER, JOHN L and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************57 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

KINSEY, JENNIE

SHACKELFORD, JAN

MILLER, JOHN L

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RICHARDSON, MORGAN AMELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Defendant Attorney

CRAWFORD, CHRISTOPHER R

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO MODIFY OR SET BOND

1/22/2020: MOTION TO MODIFY OR SET BOND

ORDER OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNITCATION TO COURT

1/8/2020: ORDER OF REFERENCE REGARDING EX PARTE COMMUNITCATION TO COURT

CORRESPONDENCE FILED

12/11/2019: CORRESPONDENCE FILED

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

11/27/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

NOTICE OF ROGATORY APPOINTMENT

11/19/2019: NOTICE OF ROGATORY APPOINTMENT

CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED

11/12/2019: CAPIAS RETURNED SERVED

ARREST REPORT

11/12/2019: ARREST REPORT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

10/1/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

9/13/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

10/2/2019: NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

10/2/2019: NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

7/24/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

6/18/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

FIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/8/2019: FIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/1/2019: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

2/15/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/15/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/14/2019: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 06/29/2020 - FAILED TO PAY $568.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: SUSPEND DRIVERS LICENSE (FOS) REQUIRED BY: 06/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: NOTICE OF DL SUSPEND FOR NONPAYMENT OF FINES & COS REQUIRED BY: 06/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.8242.228 / 2020010403)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8241.1683 / 2020010245)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCIVIL LIEN FOR UNPAID FINES & COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AAL7FSE

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketPITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND BB5772311 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND BB5772312 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND BB5772310 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/28/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CF 000657 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (322.34(2C)) DRIVING WHILE LIC SUSP THIRD OR SUBSQ CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (843.02) RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRAWFORD, CHRISTOPHER R