This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 17:06:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RESTUCHER, JIMMY ANDREW

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RESTUCHER, JIMMY ANDREW. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBINSON, COLEMAN L, BERGOSH, GARY L and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************79 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

BERGOSH, GARY L

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RESTUCHER, JIMMY ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingDate time: 6/10/2020 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/5/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 06/10/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (784.021(1A)) AGGRAV ASSLT-W DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 4 - (806.13(1B3)) CRIM MISCH-OVER 1000 DOLLARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 3 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (784.045(1B)) AGGRAV BATTERY-OFFENDER KNEW OR SHOULD HAVE KNOWN VICTIM WAS PREGNANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/11/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/11/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000679 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.021(1A)) AGGRAV ASSLT-W DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (784.045(1B)) AGGRAV BATTERY-OFFENDER KNEW OR SHOULD HAVE KNOWN VICTIM WAS PREGNANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (806.13(1B3)) CRIM MISCH-OVER 1000 DOLLARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 4 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less