This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 17:06:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. REEVES, JASON BROOKS

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REEVES, JASON BROOKS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

REEVES, JASON BROOKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/25/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD4BF4E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD4BI0E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A2EZZYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY ON CERTIFIED RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 3 - (316.061(1)) LSOA WITHOUT GIVING INFO MORE THAN $50 DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (322.34(2A)) DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED FIRST CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/10/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF570339942 POSTED $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000309 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketCITATION FILED SEQ: 3 - (322.34(2)(B)) KNOWINGLY DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED, CANCELED, REVOKED, OR THE EQUIVALENT SECOND OR SUBSEQUENT CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketCITATION FILED SEQ: 2 - (316.061(1)) LSOA WITHOUT GIVING INFO MORE THAN $50 DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (316.193(1)) DUI ALCOHOL OR DRUGS

    Read MoreRead Less