Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/05/2021 at 20:02:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PIAZZA SHUKER, SARAH ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PIAZZA SHUKER, SARAH ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBINSON, COLEMAN L, NOBLES, LINDA L., SMITH, KERRA A and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************40 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

NOBLES, LINDA L.

SMITH, KERRA A

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PIAZZA SHUKER, SARAH ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

7/10/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8285.1036 / 2020033647)

4/27/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8285.1036 / 2020033647)

ORDER OF COMMUNITY CONTROL

4/24/2020: ORDER OF COMMUNITY CONTROL

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

4/23/2020: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

4/17/2020: PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

ARREST REPORT

4/15/2020: ARREST REPORT

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM - NO COST OF TRANSPORTATION

4/6/2020: STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM - NO COST OF TRANSPORTATION

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/16/2020: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTIFICATION OF SURETY BOND FORFEITURE

3/13/2020: NOTIFICATION OF SURETY BOND FORFEITURE

NOTIFICATION OF SURETY BOND FORFEITURE

3/13/2020: NOTIFICATION OF SURETY BOND FORFEITURE

INFORMATION

3/10/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/26/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

2/20/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

ARREST REPORT

2/20/2020: ARREST REPORT

INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

2/20/2020: INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND FORFEITURE PREPARED & SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND FORFEITURE PREPARED & SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF BOND FORFEITURE PREPARED & SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE5 136068 CNT 2 $2500.0000 DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE2 26093 CNT 3 $250.0000 DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE5 136067 CNT 1 $2500.0000 DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/20/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000840 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (810.02(4B)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (812.014(2E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 300 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (817.61) FRAUD ILLEG USE CREDIT CARDS-USE MORE 2 TIMES 6 MOS OBT GDS MONEY $100 MORE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant