This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/13/2021 at 00:51:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PERRY, BRAD ALAN

Case Summary

On 02/04/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PERRY, BRAD ALAN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************99 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PERRY, BRAD ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

4/9/2019: PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

RECALL CAPIAS/CAPIAS RECALLED VIA FAX CONFIRMATION

4/5/2019: RECALL CAPIAS/CAPIAS RECALLED VIA FAX CONFIRMATION

COURT WORKSHEET

4/5/2019: COURT WORKSHEET

NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

3/28/2019: NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

3/28/2019: NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

3/26/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

FIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/12/2019: FIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

2/25/2019: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/25/2019: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

2/21/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/21/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION

2/11/2019: INFORMATION

PTR AGREEMENT

2/7/2019: PTR AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/7/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST REPORT

2/4/2019: ARREST REPORT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/31/2020; Receipt Number: 2020008798; Applied Amount: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSTACKED PAYMENT PLAN: APPLY PAYMENTS TO FOLLOWING CASES IN ORDER 2019 CF 811, 2018 CF 6753, 2019 MM 799, 2017 CF 4035, 2011 CF 837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketSTACKED PAYMENT PLAN ESTABLISHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2020008798

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8089.1900 / 2019039165)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 05/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/21/2019 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketFRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5623165739 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5623165726 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/04/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 MM 000799 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6B)) MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant