This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 15:21:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PACE, RACHEL RENEE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PACE, RACHEL RENEE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY and KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************03 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PACE, RACHEL RENEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION C

 

Court Documents

ADDENDUM TO AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

12/4/2019: ADDENDUM TO AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

9/16/2019: AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

PROBATION ORDER

9/3/2019: PROBATION ORDER

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8135.1374 / 2019064777)

7/25/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8135.1374 / 2019064777)

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

7/24/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COURT ORDER REPORT OF DISPOSITION SENT TO DHSMV

6/11/2019: COURT ORDER REPORT OF DISPOSITION SENT TO DHSMV

BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

6/11/2019: BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODES/GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

6/4/2019: CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODES/GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

6/4/2019: SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

COURT WORKSHEET

6/4/2019: COURT WORKSHEET

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

4/9/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY

3/25/2019: CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY

SECOND AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/20/2019: SECOND AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/6/2019: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/11/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/8/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/7/2019: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

ARREST REPORT

1/22/2019: ARREST REPORT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM TO AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8135.1374 / 2019064777)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER REPORT OF DISPOSITION SENT TO DHSMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 06/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/08/2019 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketKINSEY, JENNIE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF5-70316000 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/22/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CF 000503 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant