This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 17:03:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. NOWLING, ZACHARY J

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NOWLING, ZACHARY J. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************26 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

NOWLING, ZACHARY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • FinancialCode: MM36; Description: ANIMAL CONTROL FINES; Assessment: $300.00; Paid: $0.00; Waived : $270.00; Balance: $30.00; Due Date: 09/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: ANIMAL CONTROL LIEN REQUIRED BY: 09/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 09/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/5/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: PAYABLE CO ORDINANCE ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION (88888888888); Level: I; Degree: N; Disposition: ADJ W/H BY JDG [W]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE/NO CONTEST SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RIGHTS FOR FIRST APPEARANCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/23/2020; Receipt Number: 2020006481; Applied Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2020006481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/05/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (88888888888) PAYABLE CO ORDINANCE ANIMAL CONTROL VIOLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CO 000326 A

    Read MoreRead Less