This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/13/2021 at 16:14:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MOULTON, LESLIE KAREN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MOULTON, LESLIE KAREN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY, WILLIAMS, JOYCE H, CLARK, LACEY POWELL, NOBLES, LINDA L. and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************44 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

WILLIAMS, JOYCE H

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

NOBLES, LINDA L.

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MOULTON, LESLIE KAREN

Interested Party

PAM CHILDERS CLERK OF COURT AND COMPTROLLER ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Defendant Attorneys

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

AMOND, ELIZABETH ANN

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

Interested Party Attorney

LEIGH, CODEY L

 

Court Documents

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

11/2/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

10/23/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY OR SET BOND

8/5/2020: MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY OR SET BOND

ARREST REPORT

8/4/2020: ARREST REPORT

AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

7/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

7/9/2020: AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION AND VIOLATION REPORT FORM

INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

6/13/2019: INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

PROBATION ORDER

7/30/2019: PROBATION ORDER

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8131.1037 / 2019062415)

7/18/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8131.1037 / 2019062415)

SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

7/11/2019: SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY, OR SET BOND

6/19/2019: MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY, OR SET BOND

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

6/13/2019: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

ARREST REPORT

6/13/2019: ARREST REPORT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

4/3/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY

3/25/2019: CORRESPONDENCE FILED BY OFFICE OF THE STATE ATTORNEY

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/8/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/7/2019: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

ARREST REPORT

1/22/2019: ARREST REPORT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE VIOLATION OF PROBATION/ COMMUNITY CONTROL - Recorded (OR.8412.353 / 2020102659)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE VIOLATION OF PROBATION/ COMMUNITY CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODES/GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingDate time: 11/18/2020 1:30 PM; Event: CRIMINAL PLEAS & MOTIONS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketVOP/VOCC COURT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingDate time: 11/16/2020 8:30 AM; Event: CRIMINAL MOTIONS PLEAS AND SENTENCING; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL PLEAS & MOTIONS SET FOR 11/18/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L. - VOP PLEA PER JA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL PLEAS & MOTIONS SET FOR 11/16/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L. - VOP PLEA PER JA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE5103498 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/22/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CF 000544 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (499.03) POSSESS NEW LEGEND DRUG WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (812.015(2)) PETIT FROM MERCHANT 2ND CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (893.13(1A1)) COCAINE-POSSESS WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG DELIV ETC SCHEDULE II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 4 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAM CHILDERS CLERK OF COURT AND COMPTROLLER ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant