This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 17:04:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MINATEE, QUATARIUS DONTA

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MINATEE, QUATARIUS DONTA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRODERSEN, AMY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************17 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRODERSEN, AMY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MINATEE, QUATARIUS DONTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/3/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCASH BOND 92882 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingDate time: 1/23/2020 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: VIDEO COURTROOM; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 03/03/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/23/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/23/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000317 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less