Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 22:39:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MCCORMACK, LOGAN SHAWN

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MCCORMACK, LOGAN SHAWN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NOBLES, LINDA L., YOUNG, CHARLES P, BOLES, W JOEL and SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************00 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NOBLES, LINDA L.

YOUNG, CHARLES P

BOLES, W JOEL

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MCCORMACK, LOGAN SHAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

1/21/2021: ARREST REPORT

SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

7/1/2020: SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

7/6/2020: PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/27/2020: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

PROFESSIONAL BOND 5624187938 POSTED $500.00

2/11/2020: PROFESSIONAL BOND 5624187938 POSTED $500.00

ARREST REPORT

2/7/2020: ARREST REPORT

INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

2/7/2020: INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • HearingDate time: 2/19/2021 1:30 PM; Event: VIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARINGS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY VIOLATION OF PROBATION/COMMUNITY CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDISCOVERY RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • HearingDate time: 1/21/2021 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketWARRANT FOR VOP RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketVIOLATION OF PROBATION HEARINGS SET FOR 02/19/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/21/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/28/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BOLES, W JOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/07/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN CR VID/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNOBLES, LINDA L.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/07/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000600 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3C)) PETIT THEFT THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant