This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 16:15:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MARINO, RICHARD

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MARINO, RICHARD. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DANNHEISSER., THOMAS and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************23 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MARINO, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/23/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/23/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION F ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDANNHEISSER., THOMAS: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 004123 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (941.13) OUT OF STATE FUGITIVE

    Read MoreRead Less