This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/03/2020 at 17:01:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MAGAHA, ERNIE LEE III

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MAGAHA, ERNIE LEE III. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRODERSEN, AMY P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************18 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRODERSEN, AMY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MAGAHA, ERNIE LEE III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialCode: MM35; Description: PENALTY FOR UNDERAGE TOBACCO VIOLATION 569.11; Assessment: $25.00; Paid: $25.00; Waived : $0.00; Balance: $0.00; Due Date: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: PROHIBITION ON POSSESSION OF NICOTINE PRODUCTS OR NICOTINE DISPENSING DEVICES BY MINOR (877.112(6)); Level: I; Degree: N; Disposition: CIVIL PENALTY PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/4/2020; Receipt Number: 2020010029; Applied Amount: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NO PLEA ENTERED SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2020010029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: 30 DAYS TOBACCO TICKLER REQUIRED BY: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (877.112(6)) PROHIBITION ON POSSESSION OF NICOTINE PRODUCTS OR NICOTINE DISPENSING DEVICES BY MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/04/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 IN 000518 A

    Read MoreRead Less