This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 17:03:00 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LINDSAY, CALEB ISAAC

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LINDSAY, CALEB ISAAC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BOLES, W JOEL and BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************08 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BOLES, W JOEL

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LINDSAY, CALEB ISAAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N

Defendant Attorney

BARNES, JAMES R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • HearingDate time: 4/29/2020 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/27/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BOLES, W JOEL; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 04/29/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 3; Description: BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03(1a1)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: NOFILE/NO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketNOFILE/NO PROSECUTION SEQ: 3 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (784.021(1A)) AGGRAV ASSLT-W DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 05510572543 POSTED $50,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 02710545206 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 02710545205 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/06/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000608 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.021(1A)) AGGRAV ASSLT-W DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (810.02(2A)) BURGL-WITH ASSAULT OR BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less