This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 17:01:09 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. LARGE, JONATHAN WESLEY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LARGE, JONATHAN WESLEY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P, DANNHEISSER., THOMAS and KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************16 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LARGE, JONATHAN WESLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION C

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/12/2020 8:30 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: KINSEY, JENNIE; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/13/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: DANNHEISSER., THOMAS; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 05/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE ---- BOND TO BE ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNO PROSECUTION WITH CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 2; Description: STOLEN PROP DEAL IN (812.019(1)); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: NOFILE/NO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOFILE/NO PROSECUTION SEQ: 2 - (812.019(1)) STOLEN PROP DEAL IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3C)) PETIT THEFT THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/13/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/22/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketKINSEY, JENNIE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/22/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000316 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3A)) PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (812.019(1)) STOLEN PROP DEAL IN

    Read MoreRead Less