This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 17:08:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOHNSON, ROBERT RAYMOND

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, ROBERT RAYMOND. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************24 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOHNSON, ROBERT RAYMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 10/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/16/2020 9:00 AM; Event: CRIMINAL PLEAS & MOTIONS; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT SECOND OFFENSE (812.014(3b)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: GUILTY [G]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE/NO CONTEST SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/15/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 004124 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less